EP4365469 - STATOR ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC EXPANSION VALVE HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Dunan Artificial Environment Co., Ltd. Diankou Industrial Area, Zhuji Shaoxing, Zhejiang 311835 / CN | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Zhongbo Shaoxing, Zhejiang 311835 / CN | 02 /
SONG, Zhiguo Shaoxing, Zhejiang 311835 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Fugang Shaoxing, Zhejiang 311835 / CN | 04 /
JIN, Ju Shaoxing, Zhejiang 311835 / CN | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22831553.7 | 26.05.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022CN95333 | Priority number, date | CN202121465503U | 29.06.2021 Original published format: CN 202121465503 U | [2024/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023273730 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4365469 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/08 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H01F7/14 (EP);
F16K31/0655 (KR);
F16K31/0675 (US);
F16K31/06 (EP);
F16K31/08 (EP,KR);
F16K31/082 (US);
F16K37/0033 (US);
H01F7/06 (KR);
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K21/145 (EP);
H02K5/225 (EP);
H01F2007/062 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | STATORANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHES EXPANSIONSVENTIL DAMIT | [2024/19] | English: | STATOR ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC EXPANSION VALVE HAVING SAME | [2024/19] | French: | ENSEMBLE STATOR ET DÉTENDEUR ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2023 | Translation filed | 28.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008178291 (SAGINOMIYA SEISAKUSHO INC); | [A]US2014161651 (GRIMES DAVID J [US]); | [X]CN111765289 (DUNAN ENV TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN113028072 (DUNAN ENV TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN215806673U (DUNAN AUTOMOBILE THERMAL MANAGEMENT TECH CO LTD) |