EP4366145 - CLEANING AND NURSING APPLIANCE, AND TRANSDUCER DEVICE AND PRESSURE ALARM MECHANISM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Shift Electrics Co., Ltd. No. 489 Jinbai Road Jinshan Industrial Zone Shanghai 201506 / CN | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Xiaoguo Shanghai 201506 / CN | 02 /
XU, Zhenwu Shanghai 201506 / CN | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22832002.4 | 28.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022CN101744 | Priority number, date | CN202110719558 | 28.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110719558 | [2024/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023274188 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366145 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/02, A61C17/26, G01L1/26 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G01L1/26 (EP,CN);
H02K33/02 (EP,CN);
A61C17/26 (CN);
A61C17/3481 (EP);
A61C17/221 (EP);
A61C17/224 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGS- UND PFLEGEGERÄT SOWIE WANDLERVORRICHTUNG UND DRUCKALARMMECHANISMUS DAFÜR | [2024/19] | English: | CLEANING AND NURSING APPLIANCE, AND TRANSDUCER DEVICE AND PRESSURE ALARM MECHANISM THEREFOR | [2024/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE ET DE SOINS, ET DISPOSITIF TRANSDUCTEUR ET MÉCANISME D'ALARME DE PRESSION ASSOCIÉS | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | Translation filed | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |