EP4364844 - CATALYST FOR SYNTHESIZING LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-4, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIKAWA Takashi Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
IWANO Yuki Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
MORI Tomohiko Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI Hiroko Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
BAMBA Yuichiro Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 06 /
KAWAMATA Yuki Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 07 /
LEE Yu Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 08 /
HIRANO Junya Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 09 /
FUKUSHIMA Masayuki Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22833332.4 | 01.07.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022JP26507 | Priority number, date | JP20210111072 | 02.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021111072 | JP20220067955 | 15.04.2022 Original published format: JP 2022067955 | [2024/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023277187 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364844 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/46, B01J37/16, C10L3/12 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
C10L3/12 (EP);
B01J23/002 (EP);
B01J23/42 (EP);
B01J23/44 (EP);
B01J23/80 (EP);
B01J29/44 (EP);
B01J35/19 (EP);
B01J35/40 (EP);
B01J37/033 (EP);
B01J37/088 (EP);
B01J37/28 (EP);
B01J2229/186 (EP);
B01J2523/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/31 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/48 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR ZUR SYNTHESE VON FLÜSSIGGAS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGGAS | [2024/19] | English: | CATALYST FOR SYNTHESIZING LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS | [2024/19] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE SYNTHÈSE DE GAZ DE PÉTROLE LIQUÉFIÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE GAZ DE PÉTROLE LIQUÉFIÉ | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2023 | Translation filed | 07.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JPS6211548 (NAT DISTILLERS CHEM CORP); | [Y]WO2004076063 (JAPAN GAS SYNTHESIZE LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2006016444 (JAPAN GAS SYNTHESIZE LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2006052304 (NIPPON GAS GOSEI KK); | [Y]JP2008195773 (NIPPON GAS GOSEI KK) | by applicant | JP4558751B | JP4965258B | JP5405103B | JP2019037939 |