EP4276834 - CONTROL METHOD, SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changxin Memory Technologies, Inc. No. 388, Xingye Avenue Economic and Technological Development Area Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EOM, Yoonjoo Hefei Anhui 230601 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Lin Hefei Anhui 230601 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Zhiqiang Hefei Anhui 230601 / CN | 04 /
GONG, Yuanyuan Hefei Anhui 230601 / CN | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 22835197.9 | 19.05.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022CN93942 | Priority number, date | CN202210307454 | 25.03.2022 Original published format: CN202210307454 | CN202210498332 | 09.05.2022 Original published format: CN202210498332 | [2023/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023178821 | Date: | 28.09.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276834 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.09.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/02, G11C29/50, G11C29/12, G11C7/10 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G11C29/50008 (EP);
G11C29/022 (EP,KR);
G11C29/46 (US);
G11C11/4096 (KR);
G11C29/028 (EP);
G11C29/14 (US);
G11C29/36 (US);
G11C29/56 (KR);
G11C7/1009 (EP);
G11C7/1045 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | G11C29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN, HALBLEITERSPEICHER UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/46] | English: | CONTROL METHOD, SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, MÉMOIRE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2023 | Translation filed | 11.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6438667 (SHINOZAKI NAOHARU [JP]); | [A]US2008143377 (CHO YONG-KI [KR], et al); | [A]US2010237902 (SOHN YOUNG-HOON [KR], et al); | [A]US2015084668 (YUN JAE WOONG [KR]) | International search | [A]US2005007835 (LEE KEE-HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2012239337 (MATSUO TATSURU [JP]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2014298125 (DEVADZE SERGEI [EE], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [A]US2015016200 (CHA JEONG YUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 1-20, and description, paragraphs [0006]-[0128] *; | [A]US2015084668 (YUN JAE WOONG [KR]) [A] 1-22 * entire document * |