EP4191630 - ELECTROMAGNETIC CONTACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC FA COMPONENTS & SYSTEMS CO., LTD. 1-5-45, Minami Konosu-shi, Saitama 369-0192 / JP | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOU, Mitsuya Konosu-shi, Saitama 369-0192 / JP | 02 /
TAKAYA, Kouetsu Konosu-shi, Saitama 369-0192 / JP | 03 /
KIKUCHI, Shouta Konosu-shi, Saitama 369-0192 / JP | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 22837355.1 | 27.05.2022 | [2023/23] | WO2022JP21813 | Priority number, date | JP20210111651 | 05.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021111651 | [2023/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023281934 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191630 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/46, H01H50/00, H01H50/54 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H01H50/546 (EP,US);
H01H33/18 (US);
H01H33/20 (EP);
H01H9/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHÜTZ | [2023/23] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC CONTACTOR | [2023/23] | French: | CONTACTEUR ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/23] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2023/23: The applicant has filed a text with which it is intended to bring the translation into conformity with the application as filed (Art. 14(2) EPC). | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2023 | Translation filed | 27.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 04.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4885441 (HISATSUNE FUMIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,10* figures 3-10A *; | [X]US5638038 (SUZUKI KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10028076 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US6384702 (SMITH RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP3411206B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-7,9-13 * figures 1-12 * [I] 8; | [X]EP0948009 (MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [AY]JPS57147518U [A] 9-10, 12-13 [Y] 1-8, 11; | [Y]JPS589251U [Y] 8, 11; | [A]JPS58169822 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-13; | [AY]JP2002251933 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 9-10, 12-13 [Y] 1-8.11; | [Y]JP2002313169 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 6, 11 * paragraph [0011] *; | [Y]KR20080000473U (HUNDAI HEAVY INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.) [Y] 5, 11 * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]WO2014073026 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 11* paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US2019333721 (TIAN HAIFENG [CN], et al) [A] 9-10 * fig. 2-3 * | by applicant | JPH11162319 | JP2021111651 |