EP4366730 - COMPOSITION FOR PROMOTING RESTFUL SLEEP AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celesta Company LLC 9134 Weathervane Trail Galesburg, MI 49053 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAFOND, David, Wilfred Galesburg, MI 49053 / US | 02 /
O'NEIL, Christine, Lynn Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | 03 /
MONTMAYEUR, Jean-Pierre Atlanta, GA 30327 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22838264.4 | 30.06.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US35838 | Priority number, date | US202163218457P | 05.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163218457 P | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283108 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366730 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4045, A23L29/00, A61K31/4415, A61K31/522, A61K33/06, A61K36/575, A61K36/82, A61P25/24, A61K45/06 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A61P25/24 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A61K31/047 (EP);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/194 (US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/216 (EP);
A61K31/352 (US);
A61K31/353 (EP);
A61K31/4045 (EP,US);
A61K31/4415 (EP,US);
A61K31/7004 (US);
A61K31/7016 (US);
A61K31/7028 (EP);
A61K31/7032 (EP);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61K36/41 (EP);
A61K36/534 (EP);
A61K36/575 (EP);
A61K36/82 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/047, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/216, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4045, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7028, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7032, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/41, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/534, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG VON SCHLAF IN RUHEMODUS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2024/20] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PROMOTING RESTFUL SLEEP AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2024/20] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR FAVORISER LE SOMMEIL RÉPARATEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US7476406 (SMIDT CARSTEN [US]); | [Y]US2012059052 (KUHRTS ERIC [US]); | [Y]US2013064803 (NAIDU A SATYANARAYAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2019185439 (NATHURA S P A [IT]); | [A]US2021093687 (COOPER JENNIFER P [US]) |