EP4366522 - HIGH EFFICIENCY WATER DISTRIBUTION PLATE DESIGN FOR ENHANCED OXYGEN TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnovaSea Systems, Inc. 266 Summer Street 2nd Floor Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATTEN, Barnaby Jude Boston, Massachusetts 02210 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22838282.6 | 01.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US35985 | Priority number, date | US202163219113P | 07.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163219113 P | US202163227105P | 29.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163227105 P | US202117549957 | 14.12.2021 Original published format: US202117549957 | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283140 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366522 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01K63/04 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A01K63/042 (EP,US);
B01F23/231121 (US);
B01F23/23113 (US);
B01F23/23412 (EP);
B01F23/2368 (US);
B01F23/237612 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHEFFIZIENTE WASSERVERTEILUNGSPLATTENKONSTRUKTION FÜR VERBESSERTE SAUERSTOFFÜBERTRAGUNG | [2024/20] | English: | HIGH EFFICIENCY WATER DISTRIBUTION PLATE DESIGN FOR ENHANCED OXYGEN TRANSFER | [2024/20] | French: | CONCEPTION DE PLAQUE DE DISTRIBUTION D'EAU À HAUTE EFFICACITÉ POUR TRANSFERT D'OXYGÈNE AMÉLIORÉ | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 08.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2293236 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]); | [A]US5171438 (KORCZ ROBERT L [US]); | [A]US2015274557 (WATSON JAMES GIBBS [CA], et al); | [A]CN108862651 (HEFEI ZHUHANG ECOLOGICAL AGRICULTURAL TECH CO LTD) |