EP4367177 - POLYMER COMPOSITES COMPRISING CARBON SOURCE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohio University 340 West State Street Unit 14 Athens, OH 45701 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREMBLY, Jason Patrick Athens, Ohio 45701 / US | 02 /
DHANAPAL, Vickram Delaware, Ohio 43015 / US | 03 /
CONNELL, Daniel Patrick South Park, Pennsylvania 15129 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/20] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 22838394.9 | 07.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US36345 | Priority number, date | US202163219068P | 07.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163219068 P | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283325 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367177 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, C08L95/00, C08J5/10 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/346 (EP);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K5/09 (EP);
C08K5/20 (EP);
C08K2003/2227 (EP,US);
C08K2201/003 (US);
C08K2201/005 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L23/06 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L27/06 (EP);
C08K3/22, C08L23/06 (EP);
C08K3/346, C08L23/06 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | POLYMERVERBUNDWERKSTOFFE MIT KOHLENSTOFFQUELLENMATERIAL | [2024/20] | English: | POLYMER COMPOSITES COMPRISING CARBON SOURCE MATERIAL | [2024/20] | French: | COMPOSITES POLYMÈRES COMPRENANT UN MATÉRIAU SOURCE DE CARBONE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3404120 (GOTSHALL WILLIAM W); | [XA]US3915906 (ROMEY INGO); | [XA]US4205035 (KOLLING GEORG [DE], et al); | [XA]US5726238 (NICKEL KLAUS-DIETRICH [DE]); | [A]US2011213065 (GIESSELBACH MONIKA [DE], et al); | [Y]CN103073827 (UNIV HENAN POLYTECHNIC); | [XYA]US2021102071 (TREMBLY JASON PATRICK [US], et al); |