EP4366629 - STRETCH RESISTANT EMBOLIC COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microvention, Inc. 35 Enterprise Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEWITT, Todd Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | 02 /
DESAI, Karishma Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | 03 /
MILHOUS, Parker Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | 04 /
LIN, Tao Aliso Viejo, California 92656 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22838577.9 | 07.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US73509 | Priority number, date | US202163219282P | 07.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163219282 P | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283598 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366629 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61F2/01, A61F2/95, A61M25/00, A61M29/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A61B17/12113 (EP,US);
A61B17/12154 (EP,US);
A61B17/12145 (EP);
A61B17/1215 (EP);
A61B17/12168 (EP);
A61B2017/1205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | DEHNBESTÄNDIGE EMBOLIESPIRALE | [2024/20] | English: | STRETCH RESISTANT EMBOLIC COIL | [2024/20] | French: | SPIRE MÉTALLIQUE POUR EMBOLISATION RÉSISTANTE À L'ÉTIREMENT | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US8202292 (KELLETT JAMES B [US]); | [A]US8864790 (STRAUSS BRIAN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US8932318 (LORENZO JUAN A [US]); | [X]US9717500 (TIEU TAI D [US], et al) |