EP4367217 - RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISM-BASED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRITTON, Robert Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 02 /
BEETON, Christine Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 03 /
HYSER, Joseph Houston, Texas 77030 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22838609.0 | 08.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US73569 | Priority number, date | US202163219717P | 08.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163219717 P | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283646 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367217 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A61K35/741, A61K38/02 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP);
A61K35/741 (EP);
C07K14/43504 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP);
C12R2001/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | AUF REKOMBINANTEN MIKROORGANISMEN BASIERENDE VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [2024/20] | English: | RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISM-BASED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF DISEASE | [2024/20] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE MICRO-ORGANISMES RECOMBINÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 09.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0003687 (ELAN PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]US2003059923 (FEDER JOHN N [US], et al) [A] 1-3* entire document *; | [A]US2006183105 (AIYAR JAYASHREE [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [X]US2020262877 (MEHLIN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A] - Anangi Raveendra, Koshy Shyny, Huq Redwan, Beeton Christine, Chuang Woei-Jer, King Glenn F., "Recombinant Expression of Margatoxin and Agitoxin-2 in Pichia pastoris: An Efficient Method for Production of KV1.3 Channel Blockers", PLoS ONE, (20121201), vol. 7, no. 12, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0052965, page e52965, XP093023432 [A] 1-3 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0052965 |