EP4286980 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING BATTERY COVER FASTENING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kiwon Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22842259.8 | 13.05.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022KR06851 | Priority number, date | KR20210092496 | 14.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210092496 | [2023/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023286996 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4286980 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H01M50/247 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H01M50/262 (EP);
G06F1/1635 (EP,KR);
H05K5/0013 (US);
G06F1/16 (EP);
G06F1/1628 (KR);
G06F1/1656 (EP);
H01M50/247 (EP,KR);
H05K5/0086 (US);
B65D2585/88 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT BATTERIEABDECKUNGSBEFESTIGUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2023/49] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING BATTERY COVER FASTENING STRUCTURE | [2023/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE DE FIXATION DE COUVERCLE DE BATTERIE | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2023 | Translation filed | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2405407 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]KR20100037852 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2010279163 (LAO PO-CHAO [TW]); | [Y]KR20130135647 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20190051125 (LIM CHAE HO [KR], et al); | [YA]KR102192148B |