EP4372461 - OPTICAL LAMINATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, SMART WINDOW COMPRISING SAME, AND WINDOW AND DOOR FOR VEHICLE AND BUILDING, HAVING SAME APPLIED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dongwoo Fine-Chem Co., Ltd. 132, Yakchon-ro Iksan-si, Jeollabuk-do 54631 / KR | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong-Hwi Sejong 30100 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Dong-Duk Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 14587 / KR | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22842398.4 | 11.07.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022KR10055 | Priority number, date | KR20210093370 | 16.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210093370 | [2024/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023287136 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4372461 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/137, G02B5/30, G02F1/1335, G02F1/1337 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G02B5/30 (EP);
G02F1/137 (KR);
G02B5/3033 (EP,KR);
G02B5/3058 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133528 (EP,KR);
G02F1/1337 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES LAMINAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, INTELLIGENTES FENSTER DAMIT SOWIE FENSTER UND TÜR FÜR FAHRZEUG UND GEBÄUDE DAMIT | [2024/21] | English: | OPTICAL LAMINATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, SMART WINDOW COMPRISING SAME, AND WINDOW AND DOOR FOR VEHICLE AND BUILDING, HAVING SAME APPLIED THERETO | [2024/21] | French: | STRATIFIÉ OPTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, FENÊTRE INTELLIGENTE LE COMPRENANT, ET FENÊTRE ET PORTE POUR VÉHICULE ET BÂTIMENT, AUXQUELLES IL EST APPLIQUÉ | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | Translation filed | 16.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR20070094188 (BOE HYDIS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20140091363 (DONGWOO FINE CHEM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2015168779 (KIM DO WON [KR], et al); | [Y]KR102174676B ; | [Y]KR20210000887 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) | by applicant | JP20180010035 |