EP4371790 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HANKOOK TIRE & TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD 286, Pangyo-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, A Reum Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13524 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Myong Joong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17098 / KR | 03 /
SON, Su Jin Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13494 / KR | 04 /
JANG, Hee Sung Seoul 06257 / KR | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22842449.5 | 13.07.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022KR10185 | Priority number, date | KR20210092236 | 14.07.2021 Original published format: KR 20210092236 | [2024/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023287187 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371790 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60C13/02, B60C15/06, B60C23/19, B60C17/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B60C13/02 (EP,KR);
B60C15/06 (KR);
B60C17/00 (KR);
B60C23/19 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2024/21] | English: | TIRE | [2024/21] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2024 | Translation filed | 30.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20100134752 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [X]KR20130085448 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [XY]JP2015209048 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [Y]JP2017065602 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2021024436 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) |