EP4369808 - POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Hongli Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xueru Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22845271.0 | 18.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022CN106264 | Priority number, date | CN202110814960 | 19.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110814960 | CN20211115466 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: CN202111015466 | [2024/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023001106 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4369808 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
G01S5/0284 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP);
H04W64/006 (EP);
G01S5/0236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2024/20] | English: | POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2024 | Translation filed | 08.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |