EP4270046 - ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UI Takehiro Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
FUKE Kazuhiro Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
MATSUZAKI Yuya Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
AKIYAMA Kyohei Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 22845965.7 | 20.07.2022 | [2023/44] | WO2022JP28279 | Priority number, date | JP20210121072 | 21.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021121072 | [2023/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023003032 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4270046 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/03, H05K9/00, G01S13/931 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G01S7/027 (EP,KR);
H01Q1/526 (EP,KR,US);
H05K9/0086 (US);
G01S13/931 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/023 (US);
G01S7/03 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | ABSCHIRMUNG GEGEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE WELLEN | [2023/44] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE SHIELD | [2023/44] | French: | BLINDAGE CONTRE LES ONDES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | Translation filed | 26.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JPH1140689 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2004138415 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2005094537 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JP2014134414 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [Y]US2016268693 (DING XUERU [US], et al) | by applicant | JP5696781B | US10074907 |