EP4373900 - SCALE INHIBITORS AND RELATED CONTROLLED RELEASE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LFS Chemistry Incorporated 1100 North Cresson Hwy. Cresson, TX 76035 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LALGUDI, Ramanathan S. Westerville, Ohio 43081 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22846551.4 | 20.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022US37694 | Priority number, date | US202163224439P | 22.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163224439 P | US202263341550P | 13.05.2022 Original published format: US 202263341550 P | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023003943 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373900 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/52, E21B37/06 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
E21B37/06 (EP);
C09K8/536 (US);
C09K8/035 (EP);
C09K8/516 (EP);
C09K8/805 (EP);
C09K8/88 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KESSELSTEINHEMMER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE PARTIKEL MIT KONTROLLIERTER FREISETZUNG | [2024/22] | English: | SCALE INHIBITORS AND RELATED CONTROLLED RELEASE PARTICLES | [2024/22] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE TARTRE ET PARTICULES À LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE ASSOCIÉES | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYA]US2009038799 (GARCIA-LOPEZ DE VICTORIA MARIELIZ [US], et al); | [Y]US2014262247 (DUENCKEL ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]WO2014186220 (PREFERRED TECHNOLOGY LLC [US]); | [A]WO2015112130 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]); |