EP4361789 - SCREEN MIRRORING METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | 29.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Decai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Bo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Can Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22848640.3 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022CN108631 | Priority number, date | CN202110874235 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110874235 | [2024/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023006035 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361789 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/0486 (EP);
G06F3/1454 (EP,US);
G06F3/0354 (US);
G06F3/0481 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDSCHIRMSPIEGELUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/18] | English: | SCREEN MIRRORING METHOD AND SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2024/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DUPLICATION D'ÉCRAN ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2024 | Translation filed | 25.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |