EP4378954 - ANTI-PVRIG/ANTI-TIGIT BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY AND APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shandong Simcere Biopharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 1, Heilongjiang Road Yantai Economic and Technological Development Zone Yantai Shandong 264006 / CN | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Xiaofeng Shanghai 201318 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Lei Shanghai 201318 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Yang Jiangsu 210042 / CN | 04 /
FU, Yayuan Shanghai 201318 / CN | 05 /
CAO, Zhuoxiao Shanghai 201318 / CN | 06 /
TANG, Renhong Shanghai 201318 / CN | 07 /
REN, Jinsheng Jiangsu 210041 / CN | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22848645.2 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022CN108648 | Priority number, date | CN202110872620 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110872620 | CN202110874745 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110874745 | CN202110903850 | 06.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110903850 | CN202210276638 | 21.03.2022 Original published format: CN202210276638 | [2024/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023006040 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4378954 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/28 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BISPEZIFISCHER ANTI-PVRIG/ANTI-TIGIT-ANTIKÖRPER UND ANWENDUNG | [2024/23] | English: | ANTI-PVRIG/ANTI-TIGIT BISPECIFIC ANTIBODY AND APPLICATION | [2024/23] | French: | ANTICORPS BISPÉCIFIQUE ANTI-PVRIG/ANTI-TIGIT ET APPLICATION | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2024 | Translation filed | 12.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |