EP4379774 - SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIMOTO Kazunori Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22849106.4 | 27.06.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022JP25496 | Priority number, date | JP20210124488 | 29.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021124488 | [2024/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023008034 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379774 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/263, H01L21/322, H01L21/338, H01L29/778, H01L29/812 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H01L29/2003 (EP,KR);
H01L21/0243 (KR);
H01L21/02381 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02458 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02505 (KR);
H01L21/0254 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02694 (EP,KR);
H01L21/263 (EP);
H01L21/322 (EP);
H01L29/66462 (KR);
H01L29/66848 (EP);
H01L29/778 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRAT FÜR HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2024/23] | English: | SUBSTRATE FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2024/23] | French: | SUBSTRAT POUR DISPOSITIFS À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2024 | Translation filed | 17.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AY]JP2003059948 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2004119936 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [YAX]JP2009231550 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [AY]JP2011119715 (DOWA ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CO); | [AY]JP2015503853 ; | [PA]JP2021190667 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK) | by applicant | JP2010225703 |