EP4378927 - POLYTHIOL COMPOSITION AND APPLICATION OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANO, Shotaro Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Masakazu Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22849589.1 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022JP29134 | Priority number, date | JP20210126033 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021126033 | [2024/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023008528 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4378927 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/02, C07C319/20, C07C319/28, C07C321/14, C07C323/64, C08G18/38, G02B1/04 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G02B1/041 (EP,US);
C08G18/3876 (EP,KR,US);
C07C321/14 (KR,US);
C07C323/12 (KR);
C08G18/246 (EP);
C08G18/7642 (EP,KR);
G02B1/04 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/041, C08L75/04, C08L81/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | POLYTHIOLZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/23] | English: | POLYTHIOL COMPOSITION AND APPLICATION OF SAME | [2024/23] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYTHIOL ET SON APPLICATION | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2024 | Translation filed | 12.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1129653 (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK, et al); | [A]CN103483620 (CHANGZHOU INST ENG TECH); | [Y]WO2014027427 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | [Y]WO2014027428 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | [PX]WO2021157701 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | [PX]WO2021157702 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]); | by applicant | JPS6346213 | JPH02270859 | JPH07252207 | WO2008047626 | WO2014027427 | WO2014027428 | WO2017047745 | JP2021126033 |