EP4376821 - TREATING CANCERS WITH COMBINATIONS OF SPIRONOLACTONE AND ACYLFULVENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lantern Pharma Inc. 1920 McKinney Avenue, 7th Floor Dallas, TX 75201 / US | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KULKARNI, Aditya Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 02 /
BHATIA, Kishor Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Jianli Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Dr. Träger & Strautmann PAe PartG mbB Stüvestraße 2 49076 Osnabrück / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22850538.4 | 29.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022US74297 | Priority number, date | US202163227257P | 29.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163227257 P | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023010107 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376821 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/122, A61K31/17, A61K31/585, C07C239/14, A61P35/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61K31/17 (EP,KR);
A61K31/122 (EP,KR);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR);
A61K31/58 (KR);
A61K31/585 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/17, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/585, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS MIT KOMBINATIONEN AUS SPIRONOLACTON UND ACYLFULVENEN | [2024/23] | English: | TREATING CANCERS WITH COMBINATIONS OF SPIRONOLACTONE AND ACYLFULVENES | [2024/23] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS AVEC DES COMBINAISONS DE SPIRONOLACTONE ET D'ACYLFULVÈNES | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006264384 (JOHANSEN LISA M [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017180086 (POP TEST ONCOLOGY LTD LIABILITY COMPANY [US]); | [A]US2018185392 (ALTSCHUL RANDICE LISA [US], et al); | [A]WO2020051222 (LANTERN PHARMA INC [US]); | [Y]WO2020081414 (LANTERN PHARMA INC [US]); | [Y]US2020340067 (KNUDSEN STEEN [US]); |