EP4182108 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF BONDING WAX COMPONENTS FOR LOST WAX CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chromalloy Gas Turbine LLC 3999 RCA Boulevard Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33410 / US | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITTON, James East Burke, VT 05832 / US | 02 /
ORAS, Zachary Riverview, FL 33578 / US | 03 /
HOPKINS, Zachary San Diego, CA 92111 / US | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 22854457.3 | 24.08.2022 | [2023/21] | WO2022US75422 | Priority number, date | US202163260524P | 24.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163260524 P | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023028535 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4182108 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/04, B22C7/02, B22C9/08, B22C9/22 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B22C7/02 (EP);
B22C7/026 (EP);
B22C9/04 (EP);
B22C9/082 (EP);
B22C9/22 (EP);
B22C9/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/21] | B22C9/04, B22C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON WACHSKOMPONENTEN ZUM VERLORENEN WACHSGIESSEN | [2023/21] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF BONDING WAX COMPONENTS FOR LOST WAX CASTING | [2023/21] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE LIAISON DE COMPOSANTS DE CIRE POUR LA COULÉE EN CIRE PERDUE | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8082972 (PHIPPS BRUCE [US]); | [A]US2018272452 (CLARK CONNIE A [US], et al); | [A]WO2019122797 (CASTINGS TECH INTERNATIONAL LIMITED [GB]); | International search | [A]US2004167270 (CHANG DANE [US], et al); | [A]US7448434 (TURKINGTON MICHAEL K [US], et al); | [A]US8082972 (PHIPPS BRUCE [US]); | [A]US2016288201 (BULLIED STEVEN J [US], et al); | [A]US2020101526 (NIANE NGADIA TAHA [FR], et al) |