EP4385083 - SURFACE-MODIFIED ELECTRODES, PREPARATION METHODS AND ELECTROCHEMICAL USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydro-Québec 75 René-Lévesque Ouest Montréal, Québec H2Z 1A4 / CA | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELAPORTE, Nicolas Montréal, Québec H1W 1H4 / CA | 02 /
COLLIN-MARTIN, Steve Saint-Hubert, Québec J3Y 5S1 / CA | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22854839.2 | 12.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022CA51231 | Priority number, date | CA20213128220 | 13.08.2021 Original published format: CA 3128220 | [2024/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023015396 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4385083 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M10/0525 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H01M4/62 (EP,KR);
H01M4/134 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR);
H01M10/4235 (EP,KR);
H01M4/043 (EP,KR);
H01M4/1395 (EP,KR);
H01M4/405 (EP,KR);
H01M4/622 (EP,KR);
H01M4/662 (EP,KR);
H01M4/663 (EP,KR);
H01M4/72 (EP,KR);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR);
H01M2004/027 (EP,KR);
H01M4/366 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENMODIFIZIERTE ELEKTRODEN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VERWENDUNGEN | [2024/25] | English: | SURFACE-MODIFIED ELECTRODES, PREPARATION METHODS AND ELECTROCHEMICAL USES | [2024/25] | French: | ÉLECTRODES À SURFACE MODIFIÉE, PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION, ET UTILISATIONS ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016072132 (LIAO ZHAOHUI [US], et al); | [A]US2019058185 (LEE HYE JIN [KR], et al); | [A]KR20190054970 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [X]US2019393482 (HE HUI [US], et al); | [A]US2019393544 (ZHAMU ARUNA [US], et al); | [A]US2020212446 (XIAO XINGCHENG [US], et al); | [A]US2021043939 (PARIS ESCRIBANO RODRIGO [ES], et al); | [A]WO2021093607 (NINGDE AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD [CN]); | [PA]CA3072784 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]); |