EP4390401 - SAMPLE ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI HIGH-TECH CORPORATION 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Hiroshi Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
FUKUMURA, Mami Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMURA, Yoshiaki Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 04 /
OGUCHI, So Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22857083.4 | 19.07.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022JP27987 | Priority number, date | JP20210135063 | 20.08.2021 Original published format: JP 2021135063 | [2024/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023021904 | Date: | 23.02.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390401 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/08 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G01N35/08 (EP,US);
G01N33/54326 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENANALYSEGERÄT | [2024/26] | English: | SAMPLE ANALYZER | [2024/26] | French: | ANALYSEUR D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2024 | Translation filed | 20.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2004535292 ; | [X]JP2013238420 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [A]JP2019152655 (YUCHEN ZHOU); | [A]WO2020061696 (OCTANE BIOTECH INC [CA]) | by applicant | JP2021135063 |