EP4389742 - BENZO NITROGEN-CONTAINING HETEROAROMATIC RING DERIVATIVE AND USE THEREOF IN MEDICINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xizang Haisco Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Xingfu Jiayuan Economic Development Zone Jieba Town, Naidong District Lhoka, Tibet 856099 / CN | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Chen Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 02 /
LIAO, Yuting Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Guozhi Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Dachao Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 05 /
YU, Yan Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 06 /
TANG, Pingming Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 07 /
CHENG, Xinfan Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 08 /
LI, Yao Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 09 /
NI, Jia Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | 10 /
YAN, Pangke Chengdu, Sichuan 611130 / CN | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22857877.9 | 18.08.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022CN113216 | Priority number, date | CN202110940107 | 18.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110940107 | CN20211148416 | 08.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111048416 | CN202111532328 | 16.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111532328 | CN202210255370 | 22.03.2022 Original published format: CN202210255370 | CN202210496109 | 12.05.2022 Original published format: CN202210496109 | CN202210558720 | 25.05.2022 Original published format: CN202210558720 | CN202210903696 | 29.07.2022 Original published format: CN202210903696 | [2024/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023020566 | Date: | 23.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4389742 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D401/02, C07D401/14, C07D403/06, C07D403/02, C07D403/14, A61K31/454, A61P13/12 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
A61P13/12 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/454 (IL,KR);
C07D401/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/438 (KR);
C07D401/02 (IL);
C07D401/14 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D403/02 (IL);
C07D403/06 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D403/14 (EP,IL);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR);
C07D471/10 (EP);
C07D491/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZOSTICKSTOFFHALTIGES HETEROAROMATISCHES RINGDERIVAT UND VERWENDUNG DAVON IN DER MEDIZIN | [2024/26] | English: | BENZO NITROGEN-CONTAINING HETEROAROMATIC RING DERIVATIVE AND USE THEREOF IN MEDICINE | [2024/26] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE CYCLE HÉTÉROAROMATIQUE CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE BENZO ET SON UTILISATION EN MÉDECINE | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2024 | Translation filed | 14.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |