EP4393330 - AEROSOL GENERATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Merit Technology Co., Ltd 29-6-7, No.29, Dongfang Avenue Dongfang Community, Songgang Street Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518105 / CN | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xingfu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518105 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Wei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518105 / CN | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22860254.6 | 10.08.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022CN111519 | Priority number, date | CN202110984477 | 25.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110984477 | [2024/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023024908 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393330 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/46 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP,CN);
A24F40/20 (EP,CN);
A24F40/46 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/27] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATING APPARATUS | [2024/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D?AÉROSOL | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2024 | Translation filed | 13.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |