EP4344216 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING PLURALITY OF IMAGE STREAMS WHILE PERFORMING VIDEO CALL, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DO, Taewon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yongtae Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
GHO, Gwanghyun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Hoonjae Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
JUN, Hyeyoung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22861504.3 | 27.04.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022KR05987 | Priority number, date | KR20210111226 | 23.08.2021 Original published format: KR 20210111226 | [2024/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023027288 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344216 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.03.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14, H04N21/2343, H04N21/4402, H04N21/2365, H04N21/434, H04N21/658, H04L65/80, H04L65/75, H04L65/403, H04N7/15, H04L65/756 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
H04L65/756 (EP);
H04N21/2343 (KR);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04L65/403 (EP);
H04L65/762 (EP);
H04N21/23439 (EP);
H04N21/2365 (KR);
H04N21/4347 (KR);
H04N21/4402 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2024/13] | H04N21/2343, H04N21/4402, H04N21/2365, H04N21/434, H04N7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG MEHRERER BILDSTRÖME WÄHREND EINES VIDEOANRUFS UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2024/13] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING PLURALITY OF IMAGE STREAMS WHILE PERFORMING VIDEO CALL, AND METHOD FOR OPERATING ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE TRANSMISSION D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE FLUX D'IMAGES TOUT EN METTANT EN ?UVRE UN APPEL VIDÉO, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | Translation filed | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016072868 (POULIN ERIC [CA]); | [X]US2017054777 (LEUNG NIKOLAI KONRAD [US], et al); | [A]US2021184877 (BLUM NIKLAS [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR20180087697 (HANWHA AEROSPACE CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20180108310 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20190031239 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [Y]KR20190135340 (SAMSUNG SDS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20210055278 (LINE PLUS CORP [KR]) |