EP4193599 - TEMPLATE-MATCHING BASED ADAPTIVE MOTION VECTOR RESOLUTION (AMVR) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Lien-Fei Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LI, Xiang Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22862370.8 | 04.10.2022 | [2023/24] | WO2022US77519 | Priority number, date | US202163273070P | 28.10.2021 Original published format: US 202163273070 P | US202163289128P | 13.12.2021 Original published format: US 202163289128 P | US202217958161 | 30.09.2022 Original published format: US202217958161 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023076787 | Date: | 04.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193599 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/523, H04N19/53, H04N19/577, // H04N19/109, H04N19/159, H04N19/176 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04N19/53 (EP,KR);
H04N19/136 (KR,US);
H04N19/105 (KR,US);
H04N19/132 (KR);
H04N19/159 (EP,KR);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/186 (KR);
H04N19/52 (EP,KR);
H04N19/523 (EP,KR);
H04N19/577 (EP,KR);
H04N19/70 (KR);
H04N19/88 (KR,US);
H04N19/109 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | H04N19/51, H04N19/103 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF VORLAGENABGLEICH BASIERENDE ADAPTIVE BEWEGUNGSVEKTORAUFLÖSUNG (AMVR) | [2023/24] | English: | TEMPLATE-MATCHING BASED ADAPTIVE MOTION VECTOR RESOLUTION (AMVR) | [2023/24] | French: | RÉSOLUTION DE VECTEUR DE MOUVEMENT ADAPTATIVE (AMVR) BASÉE SUR L'APPARIEMENT DE MODÈLES | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 01.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021092434 (HUANG HAN [US], et al); | [XI]EP3806461 (WILUS INST STANDARDS & TECH INC [KR], et al); | International search | [A]US2016286230 (LI XIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2018249154 (CHUANG TZU-DER [TW], et al); | by applicant | US2021092434 | EP3806461 |