EP4379704 - BACKLIGHT CONTROL CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiant (Guangzhou) Opto-Electronics Co., Ltd. No.11 Xinrui Road Science City of Guangzhou High-tech Industrial Development Zone Guangzhou, Guangdong 510130 / CN | For all designated states Radiant Opto-Electronics Corporation No.1, Central 6th Rd. Qianzhen Dist. Kaohsiung, Taiwan 80681 / CN | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Li-Fei Kaohsiung City, Taiwan 80681 / TW | 02 /
HSIEH, Yu-Lin Kaohsiung City, Taiwan 80681 / TW | 03 /
FANG, Sheng-Kai Kaohsiung City, Taiwan 80681 / TW | 04 /
KAO, Pei-Ling Kaohsiung City, Taiwan 80681 / TW | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22863418.4 | 30.08.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022CN115661 | Priority number, date | WO2021CN115842 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: PCT/CN2021/115842 | [2024/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023030283 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379704 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G09G3/3426 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0264 (KR,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/0285 (KR);
G09G2320/0626 (EP);
G09G2320/064 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HINTERGRUNDBELEUCHTUNGSSTEUERSCHALTUNG | [2024/23] | English: | BACKLIGHT CONTROL CIRCUIT | [2024/23] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2024 | Translation filed | 29.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 29.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |