EP4396905 - ANTENNA ASSEMBLY AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHAN, Zulfiqar A. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HAUGEN, Gregory M. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
KIM, Jaewon Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
WEINMANN, Christian 41453 Neuss / DE | 05 /
VEERARAGHAVAN, Badri Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
SCHNEIDER, Bernhard C. 41453 Neuss / DE | 07 /
TOSTENRUDE, Jeffrey A. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
BRUZZONE, Charles L. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
SCHRIX, Lars 41453 Neuss / DE | 10 /
SOKOL, Jennifer J. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 11 /
SABO, Andreea 41453 Neuss / DE | 12 /
BRODDNER, Pontus S.B. 19189 Solluntuna / SE | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22863727.8 | 23.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022IB57889 | Priority number, date | US202163260763P | 31.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163260763 P | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023031731 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4396905 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/22, H01Q15/02 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H01Q19/062 (EP);
H01Q15/02 (EP);
H01Q21/061 (EP);
H01Q3/2658 (EP);
H01Q1/241 (EP);
H01Q25/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2024/28] | English: | ANTENNA ASSEMBLY AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2024/28] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ANTENNE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20050061391 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [A]US2010079354 (LAM TAI ANH [US], et al); | [A]US8264410 (WANG JOHNSON J H [US]); | [A]US2014159976 (DE ROCHEMONT L PIERRE [US]); | [A]US10256551 (SHEHAN JOSHUA W [US]) |