EP4397905 - CIRCUIT DEVICE AND LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 22-6, Moto-machi Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0057 / JP | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Satoshi Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0057 / JP | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22864100.7 | 21.07.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022JP28388 | Priority number, date | JP20210141979 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: JP 2021141979 | [2024/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023032512 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4397905 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F21V23/00, F21S2/00, F21V21/35, H05B45/375, H05B45/39, H05B47/19, F21Y115/10, F21Y115/15 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
F21S2/00 (EP);
H05B45/37 (EP,US);
F21V21/35 (EP);
F21V23/00 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP);
F21Y2115/15 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/28] | English: | CIRCUIT DEVICE AND LIGHTING DEVICE | [2024/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF À CIRCUIT ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2024 | Translation filed | 26.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2010147002 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD); | [A]JP2019212629 (ARBOT INC); | [Y]JP2021022430 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2021065048 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) | by applicant | JP2020119673 |