EP4398171 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING SEAT ABANDONMENT USING BIOMETRIC INFORMATION TEMPLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cubox Co., Ltd. 12 Teheran-ro 22-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul, 06236 / KR | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Yong Han Seoul 06204 / KR | 02 /
NAM, Un Sung Seoul 04311 / KR | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22864797.0 | 28.03.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022KR04295 | Priority number, date | KR20210116675 | 02.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210116675 | [2024/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023033288 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4398171 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q10/06, G06F21/32, G06Q50/10, G06Q50/20 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,KR);
G06Q10/103 (KR);
G06Q10/02 (EP);
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06Q10/063 (KR);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q30/0185 (EP);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06Q50/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG DER SITZAUFGABE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VORLAGE BIOMETRISCHER INFORMATIONEN | [2024/28] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANAGING SEAT ABANDONMENT USING BIOMETRIC INFORMATION TEMPLATE | [2024/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'ABANDON DE SIÈGE À L'AIDE D'UN MODÈLE D'INFORMATIONS BIOMÉTRIQUES | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2024 | Translation filed | 01.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20080028597 (KIM JONG HAE [KR]); | [A]KR20140138991 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]KR20200074525 (CONALOG CO LTD [KR]); | [YA]KR20210068749 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]); | [Y]KR102266157B (RYU JONG HYUN [KR]) | by applicant | WO2022KR04295 |