EP4398413 - ANTENNA APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-19 Yeongcheon-ro Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18462 / KR | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Duk Yong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17086 / KR | 02 /
JI, Kyo Sung Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18484 / KR | 03 /
RYU, Chi Back Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18392 / KR | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | SJW Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22865054.5 | 31.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022KR13063 | Priority number, date | KR20210115836 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: KR 20210115836 | [2024/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023033552 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4398413 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/02, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/12 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H01Q1/02 (EP);
H01Q1/12 (EP);
H01Q1/1228 (EP);
H01Q1/246 (EP);
H01Q1/38 (EP);
H01Q1/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG | [2024/28] | English: | ANTENNA APPARATUS | [2024/28] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANTENNE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2024 | Translation filed | 27.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR101048636B ; | [Y]US2014065996 (DICKIE ROBERT GERALD [CA], et al); | [YA]US2018219277 (HIRATA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US10044091 (DIPIERO MICHAEL J [US]); | [Y]WO2020091329 (KMW INC [KR]) |