EP4371912 - ASSEMBLY FOR DISTRIBUTING ITEMS AND AUTOMATED ITEM RECOGNITION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kriukov, Pavel Nikolaevich ul. Izvestkovaya d. 2 Irkutskaya oblast g. Shelehov, 666037 / RU | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Chimini, Francesco Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22865149.3 | 16.05.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022RU00161 | Priority number, date | RU20210125921 | 02.09.2021 Original published format: RU 2021125921 | [2024/21] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023033668 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | RU | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371912 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G43/08, B65G47/76, B65G15/12, A47F9/04, G07G1/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B65G47/68 (EP);
B65G1/1376 (US);
A47F9/04 (EP);
A47F9/047 (EP);
B65G43/08 (EP);
B65G47/31 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR VERTEILUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN UND AUTOMATISCHES GEGENSTANDSERKENNUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/21] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR DISTRIBUTING ITEMS AND AUTOMATED ITEM RECOGNITION SYSTEM | [2024/21] | French: | UNITÉ DE RÉPARTITION D'ARTICLES ET SYSTÈME AUTOMATISÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE D'ARTICLES | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2024 | Translation filed | 16.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4711357 (LANGENBECK KEITH A [US], et al); | [A]WO2009103410 (WINCOR NIXDORF INT GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]US2011220458 (SNG JOHN HEE KWEE [SG], et al); | [A]US2020115170 (CARPENTER MICHAEL D [US]) | by applicant | US2009114508 | CN207090420U |