EP4330831 - DATA CONSISTENCY MECHANISM FOR HYBRID DATA PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lemon Inc. P.O. Box 31119 Grand Pavilion Hibiscus Way, 802 West Bay Road Grand Cayman, KY1-1205 / KY | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Jianjun Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 02 /
DING, Yonghua Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 03 /
LIU, Ye Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 04 /
LI, Fangshi Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 05 /
CAO, Lixun Beijing 100086 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Yang Beijing 100086 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Li Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 08 /
ZHANG, Mingyi Los Angeles, California 90066 / US | 09 /
MENG, Xiangrui Beijing 100086 / CN | 10 /
ZHAO, Junda Beijing 100086 / CN | 11 /
ZHANG, Lei Beijing 100086 / CN | 12 /
SHI, Rui Beijing 100086 / CN | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22865179.0 | 02.08.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022SG50549 | Priority number, date | US202117462938 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: US202117462938 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2023033720 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4330831 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/23, G06F16/27, G06F16/28, G06F16/22, G06F16/901 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G06F16/283 (EP,US);
G06F16/2365 (EP,US);
G06F16/2358 (EP,US);
G06F16/278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENKONSISTENZMECHANISMUS FÜR HYBRIDE DATENVERARBEITUNG | [2024/10] | English: | DATA CONSISTENCY MECHANISM FOR HYBRID DATA PROCESSING | [2024/10] | French: | MÉCANISME DE COHÉRENCE DE DONNÉES POUR TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES HYBRIDE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014279900 (GUPTA ANURAG WINDLASS [US], et al) [A] 0 * Fig. 3; Paras. [0019], [0050], [0115] *; | [A]CN112363873 (SHANGHAI EISOO INF TECH CORP) [A] 0* Paras. [0030]-[0031 ],[0035] of the original non-English language document (a machine translation is enclosed only for your reference) *; | [X] - Tobias Mühlbauer, Rödiger Wolf, Reiser Angelika, Kemper Alfons, Neumann Thomas, "ScyPer : elastic OLAP throughput on transactional data", Proceedings of the Second Workshop on Data Analytics in the Cloud, DanaC '13, New York, New York, USA , (20130623), doi:10.1145/2486767.2486770, ISBN 978-1-4503-2202-7, pages 11 - 15, XP055389128 [X] 1-4, 9-14, 19-20 * Section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2486767.2486770 | [A] - Huang Dongxu, Liu Qi, Cui Qiu, Fang Zhuhe, Ma Xiaoyu, Xu Fei, Shen Li, Tang Liu, Zhou Yuxing, Huang Menglong, Wei Wan, Liu Cong, Zhang Jian, Li Jianjun, Wu Xuelian, Song Lingyu, Sun Ruoxi, Yu Shuaipeng, Zhao Lei, Cameron Nicholas, Pei Liquan, Tang Xin, "TiDB : a Raft-based HTAP database", Proceedings of the VLDB Endowment, New York, NY , (20200914), vol. 13, no. 12, doi:10.14778/3415478.3415535, ISSN 2150-8097, pages 3072 - 3084, XP093016878 [A] 0 * Fig. 2, Section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14778/3415478.3415535 |