EP4226994 - PREPARATION METHOD FOR ANTIBACTERIAL AND ANTI-VIRUS AIR PURIFICATION MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Jiulang High-Tech Co., Ltd. No. 29 Buyue Road Pukou Economic Development Zone Qiaolin Street Pukou District, Nanjing Jiangsu 211800 / CN | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Zhaoxiang Nanjing, Jiangsu 211800 / CN | 02 /
WU, Junwei Nanjing, Jiangsu 211800 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Hongjia Nanjing, Jiangsu 211800 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Qun Nanjing, Jiangsu 211800 / CN | 05 /
FENG, Shasha Nanjing, Jiangsu 211800 / CN | 06 /
XING, Weihong Nanjing, Jiangsu 211800 / CN | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Neumarkterstr. 21 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Eggenfeldenerstraße 56 81929 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22865918.1 | 01.06.2022 | [2023/33] | WO2022CN96536 | Priority number, date | CN202111640536 | 29.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111640536 | [2023/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023123862 | Date: | 06.07.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4226994 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.07.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/36, B01D69/12, B01D69/02, B01D67/00, B01D39/08, B01D39/16, B01D46/00, B01D71/02, B01D46/54 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
B01D67/0093 (EP);
B01D71/36 (EP,CN);
B01D39/083 (EP);
B01D39/086 (EP);
B01D39/1692 (EP);
B01D46/0028 (EP,CN);
B01D46/543 (EP,CN);
B01D67/00046 (EP);
B01D67/0079 (CN);
B01D69/02 (EP,CN);
B01D69/12 (CN);
B01D71/0212 (EP);
B01D2239/04 (EP);
B01D2239/0442 (EP);
B01D2239/0654 (EP);
B01D2239/0668 (EP);
B01D2239/10 (EP);
B01D2325/48 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | B01D71/36, B01D69/12, B01D69/02, B01D67/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ANTIBAKTERIELLEM UND ANTIVIRALEM LUFTREINIGUNGSMATERIAL | [2023/33] | English: | PREPARATION METHOD FOR ANTIBACTERIAL AND ANTI-VIRUS AIR PURIFICATION MATERIAL | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN MATÉRIAU D'ÉPURATION D'AIR ANTIBACTÉRIEN ET ANTI-VIRUS | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2023 | Translation filed | 22.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011090279 (BIONEER CORP [KR], et al); | [Y]US2015218013 (AHMAD FARRUKH [US], et al); | [Y]CN111469507 (ANHUI YUANCHEN ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION POLYTRON TECH INC) | International search | [A]US2011024355 (MANSOURI JALEH [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2014209539 (EL BADAWI NOURAN ASHRAF ABDEL HAMIED [EG], et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN106955603 (UNIV TONGJI) [A] 1-10 * description, paragraphs [0005]-[0014] *; | [A]CN207324288U (HENAN ANKELIN FILTER IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [PX]CN114247309 (JIANGSU JIANGLANG HIGH TECH SHARE LTD COMPANY, et al) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * |