EP4241858 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL TRAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | 11.08.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nantong Hawk Fitness & Sports Co., Ltd Rooms 1001 to 1014, Building 3, Wanda Plaza No. 9, Shennan Road Gangzha District Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | For all designated states Jiangsu Hawk Industry Group Co., Ltd Sitong Road Hongqiao Industry Zone Taixing City Taizhou, Jiangsu 225300 / CN | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEI, Fangfeng Nantong, Jiangsu 226000 / CN | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | JD&P Patent Attorneys Joanna Dargiewicz & Partners ul. Mysliborska 93A/50 03-185 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | JD&P Patent Attorneys Joanna Dargiewicz & Partners Ul. Mysliborska 93A/50 03-185 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 22868405.6 | 04.11.2022 | [2023/37] | WO2022CN129696 | Priority number, date | CN202220210586U | 25.01.2022 Original published format: CN 202220210586 U | [2023/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023142582 | Date: | 03.08.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241858 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63B26/00, A63B6/00, A63B22/16, A63C17/02 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
A63B26/003 (EP);
A63B22/16 (EP,US);
A63B21/0557 (EP,US);
A63B22/0046 (EP,US);
A63B22/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLES TRAININGSGERÄT | [2023/37] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL TRAINING DEVICE | [2023/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT MULTIFONCTIONNEL | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2023 | Translation filed | 29.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |