EP4224345 - METHOD FOR RUNNING APPLICATION, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Caixia Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 22871050.5 | 09.09.2022 | [2023/32] | WO2022CN118130 | Priority number, date | CN202111485506 | 07.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111485506 | [2023/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023103499 | Date: | 15.06.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4224345 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.06.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G06F21/46, G06F9/4401, G06F9/451, A63F13/424, A63F13/75, A63F13/79, G06F21/30, H04L9/40, G06F21/62 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A63F13/75 (EP);
G06F21/32 (EP,CN);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
A63F13/424 (EP,CN);
A63F13/54 (CN);
A63F13/79 (EP,CN);
G06F21/30 (EP);
G06F21/46 (CN);
G06F21/629 (EP);
G06F9/4401 (EP,CN);
G06F9/451 (EP,CN);
G06F9/543 (US);
G10L17/02 (US);
G10L17/06 (US);
G10L17/24 (US);
G10L17/26 (US);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/083 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | G06F21/32, G06F21/46, G06F9/4401, G06F9/451 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG EINER ANWENDUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/32] | English: | METHOD FOR RUNNING APPLICATION, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION D'APPLICATION, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2023 | Translation filed | 28.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 10.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN109522069 (SHENZHEN ONECONNECT TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN112434667 (HANGZHOU ELECTRONIC SOUL NETWORK TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN112494950 (SHANGHAI HEIM NETWORK TECH CO LTD) |