EP4407400 - TRANSPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2024/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Wataru Inuyama-shi, Aichi 484-8502 / JP | [2024/31] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2024/31] | Application number, filing date | 22872585.9 | 10.08.2022 | [2024/31] | WO2022JP30531 | Priority number, date | JP20210153755 | 22.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021153755 | [2024/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023047829 | Date: | 30.03.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4407400 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
G05D1/225 (EP);
G05D1/69 (KR);
B60L53/10 (KR);
G05D1/244 (EP);
G05D1/644 (EP,KR);
G05D1/646 (EP);
G05D1/693 (EP);
G05D1/6987 (EP);
G05D2105/28 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTSYSTEM | [2024/31] | English: | TRANSPORT SYSTEM | [2024/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT | [2024/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2024 | Translation filed | 25.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11268895 (KOMATSU FORKLIFT); | [A]JP2010067028 (MURATEC AUTOMATION CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH11268895 |