EP4384992 - UNIVERSAL INTRUSION DETECTION AND PREVENTION FOR VEHICLE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonatus, Inc. 330 Gibraltar Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Yu Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LING, Andrew Daly City, California 94015 / US | 03 /
VALENZUELA, Felipe Andres Valdes Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 04 /
ZONG, Xuanran Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 05 /
DHANKHAR, Sudhir Ramphal Dublin, California 94568 / US | 06 /
CHAI, Fangming San Jose, California 95132 / US | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22879366.7 | 11.10.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022US46292 | Priority number, date | US202163253950P | 08.10.2021 Original published format: US 202163253950 P | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023059938 | Date: | 13.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4384992 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00, G07C5/08 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,KR);
H04L63/1425 (EP,KR);
G06F21/554 (EP);
H04L63/20 (KR);
H04W12/121 (EP);
G06F18/00 (KR);
H04L2012/40215 (KR);
H04L2012/40273 (KR);
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04W4/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE EINDRINGDETEKTION UND -VERHINDERUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGNETZWERKE | [2024/25] | English: | UNIVERSAL INTRUSION DETECTION AND PREVENTION FOR VEHICLE NETWORKS | [2024/25] | French: | DÉTECTION ET PRÉVENTION D'INTRUSION UNIVERSELLES POUR RÉSEAUX DE VÉHICULES | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019379683 (OVERBY MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US10573168 (RAZAK ABDUL [IE], et al); | [XDYA]US2021192867 (FANG YU [US], et al); | [A]US2021197831 (CHOI EUN YOUNG [KR], et al) |