EP4228006 - LATERAL FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunan San'An Semiconductor Co., Ltd No. 399, Changxing Road High Tech Development Zone Changsha, Hunan 410217 / CN | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Wenbi Xiamen, Fujian 361110 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Cheng Xiamen, Fujian 361110 / CN | 03 /
XU, Ning Xiamen, Fujian 361110 / CN | 04 /
YEH, Nien-Tze Xiamen, Fujian 361110 / CN | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | De Arpe Tejero, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Alcalá, 26, 5ª Planta 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 22879620.7 | 15.09.2022 | [2023/33] | WO2022CN118904 | Priority number, date | CN202111629255 | 28.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111629255 | [2023/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023124246 | Date: | 06.07.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228006 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.07.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/778, H01L29/417, H01L23/522, H01L23/64, // H01L29/10, H01L29/20, H01L23/482 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H01L29/7786 (EP,US);
H01L29/0607 (US);
H01L29/0847 (US);
H01L29/1066 (EP);
H01L29/41758 (US);
H01L29/41766 (EP);
H01L29/41775 (US);
H01L29/4236 (US);
H01L29/66462 (US);
H01L2223/6655 (EP);
H01L23/4824 (EP);
H01L23/535 (EP);
H01L23/66 (EP);
H01L29/0865 (US);
H01L29/2003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | H01L29/417 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LATERALER FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/33] | English: | LATERAL FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/33] | French: | TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP LATÉRAL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2023 | Translation filed | 26.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2021335713 (HUANG XIN-HUA [TW], et al) |