EP4250454 - BATTERY PACK AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/39] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Lei Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Weihua Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 22880100.7 | 20.09.2022 | [2023/39] | WO2022CN119804 | Priority number, date | CN202122462263U | 13.10.2021 Original published format: CN 202122462263 U | [2023/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023061160 | Date: | 20.04.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4250454 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/244, H01M50/258, H01M50/289, H01M50/209, H01M50/24 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
H01M50/207 (EP);
H01M50/289 (EP,US);
H01M50/204 (US);
H01M50/209 (EP);
H01M50/218 (EP);
H01M50/231 (EP);
H01M50/242 (EP);
H01M50/244 (US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H01M50/258 (EP);
H01M50/26 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK UND FAHRZEUG | [2023/39] | English: | BATTERY PACK AND VEHICLE | [2023/39] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE ET VÉHICULE | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2023 | Translation filed | 19.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |