EP4394073 - NON-ORIENTED SILICON STEEL FOR NEW ENERGY DRIVE MOTOR, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Research of Iron and Steel, Jiangsu Province/Sha-Steel, Co. Ltd (CN) Technology Building of Jiangsu Shagang Group Jinfeng Town, Zhangjiagang Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | For all designated states Jiangsu Shagang Group Co., Ltd. Jinfeng Town Zhangjiagang City Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | For all designated states Zhangjiagang Yangtze River Cold Rolled Plate Co. Ltd. Jinfeng Town, Zhangjiagang City Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2024/27] | For all designated states Institute Of Research Of Iron And Steel, Jiangsu Province/Sha-Steel, Co. Ltd (CN) Technology Building of Jiangsu Shagang Group Jinfeng Town, Zhangjiagang Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | ||
For all designated states Jiangsu Shagang Group Co., Ltd. Jinfeng Town Zhangjiagang City Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | |||
For all designated states Zhangjiagang Yangtze River Cold Rolled Plate Co. Ltd. Jinfeng Town, Zhangjiagang City Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUE, Chongxiang Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | 02 /
QIAN, Hongwei Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | 03 /
WU, Shengjie Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | 04 /
ZHAN, Dongfang Suzhou, Jiangsu 215625 / CN | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22884900.6 | 27.01.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022CN74302 | Priority number, date | CN202111244023 | 26.10.2021 Original published format: CN202111244023 | [2024/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023070982 | Date: | 04.05.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4394073 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/20, C22C38/42, C22C38/48, C22C38/26, C22C38/46, C22C38/24, C22C38/50, C22C38/28, C22C33/04, C21D8/12 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
C21D1/26 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,KR);
B21B1/463 (EP,CN,KR);
B21B37/74 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D6/005 (EP);
C21D6/008 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP);
C21D8/12 (EP);
C21D8/1222 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D8/1233 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D8/1272 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C33/04 (CN,KR);
C22C38/004 (CN,KR);
C22C38/008 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTORIENTIERTER SILICIUMSTAHL FÜR EINEN ANTRIEBSMOTOR FÜR NEUE ENERGIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/27] | English: | NON-ORIENTED SILICON STEEL FOR NEW ENERGY DRIVE MOTOR, AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2024/27] | French: | ACIER AU SILICIUM NON ORIENTÉ POUR UN MOTEUR D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À ÉNERGIE NOUVELLE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2024 | Translation filed | 28.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0357800 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]); | [A]CN109252102 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN); | [X]CN111206192 (MAANSHAN IRON & STEEL CO LTD); | [A]CN112176250 (ZHANGJIAGANG YANGZIJIANG COLD ROLLED SHEET CO LTD, et al); | [PX]CN113684422 (JIANGSU SHAGANG INST RES IRON & STEEL, et al); | [E]CN114196887 (JIANGSU SA STEEL AND IRON RES INSTITUTE LIMITED COMPANY, et al) |