EP4231368 - LITHIUM SUPPLEMENTING METHOD AND CHARGING AND DISCHARGING METHOD FOR SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/34] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Jianghui Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Yanjie Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
LI, Xing Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
JIN, Haizu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 22891178.0 | 04.01.2022 | [2023/34] | WO2022CN70094 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023130210 | Date: | 13.07.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231368 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/44, H01M10/42 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H02J7/0069 (US);
H01M4/13 (US);
H01M4/364 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (US);
H02J7/00712 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | H01M/ | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMERGÄNZUNGSVERFAHREN UND LADE- UND ENTLADEVERFAHREN FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2023/34] | English: | LITHIUM SUPPLEMENTING METHOD AND CHARGING AND DISCHARGING METHOD FOR SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AJOUT DE LITHIUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE ET DE DÉCHARGE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2023 | Translation filed | 17.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2012195055 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [Y]CN103996820 (NANJING AMPRIUS CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * description, paragraphs 4, 10-23, 26-34, and 52-58 *; | [Y]CN105552344 (INST PHYSICS CAS) [Y] 1-12 * description, paragraphs 6-19, 68-73, 108-113, and 122-129 *; | [Y]CN107104245 (NANJING AMPRIUS CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * description, paragraphs 12 and 18-42 *; | [A]CN107978790 (HUAWEI DIGITAL TECH SUZHOU CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN109616629 (UNIV CENTRAL SOUTH) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [Y]CN111834622 (UNIV HUAZHONG SCIENCE TECH) [Y] 1-12 * description, paragraphs 9-63 and 136-143, and figure 6 *; | [Y]CN113540591 (CHINA LITHIUM BATTERY TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * description, paragraphs 8-11 and 19-37, and table 1 * |