EP4354705 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND COOKING DEVICE POSITIONING METHOD OF WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Jiwoong Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Dongoh Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Hongjoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
KANG, Heejun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SEO, Byungduck Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
HA, Jonghun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22893115.0 | 03.11.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022KR17140 | Priority number, date | KR20210153728 | 10.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210153728 | [2024/16] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023085694 | Date: | 19.05.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4354705 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/80, H02J50/10, G08B21/18, H05B6/12 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H02J50/10 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,KR,US);
H05B6/1236 (EP,US);
G08B21/18 (EP,KR);
H02J13/00001 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP);
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US);
H05B1/0266 (US);
H05B6/062 (EP);
H05B6/12 (EP,KR);
H05B6/1272 (US);
H02J2310/14 (US);
H05B2213/03 (KR);
H05B2213/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINER KOCHVORRICHTUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN STROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2024/16] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND COOKING DEVICE POSITIONING METHOD OF WIRELESS POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2024/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSITIONNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON DE DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2024 | Translation filed | 08.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018024913 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * See pages 6-9, and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]KR20200033793 (INDUCTIVE INTELLIGENCE LLC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0054], claims 1-14, and figures 1-6. *; | [A]KR102141783B (PARK CHAN YOUNG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0096], and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]KR20210054357 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0046]-[0099], claims 1-12, and figures 1-6. *; | [A]KR20210109249 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0143]-[0172], and figures 5-6. * |