EP4322299 - BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | 12.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Sung Hwan Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
SEONG, Jun Yeob Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hyoung Suk Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/07] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22893152.3 | 08.11.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022KR17457 | Priority number, date | KR20210155901 | 12.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210155901 | [2024/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023085732 | Date: | 19.05.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322299 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/258, H01M50/242, H01M50/30, H01M50/211 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H01M50/258 (EP,KR);
H01M50/242 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/30 (EP);
H01M50/367 (US);
H01M50/394 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL UND BATTERIEPACK DAMIT | [2024/07] | English: | BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK COMPRISING SAME | [2024/07] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE ET BATTERIE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | Translation filed | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR20100081942 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]US2011200856 (YASUI SHUNSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]KR20130122323 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20160082073 (HL GREENPOWER INC [KR]); | [XY]KR20190112582 (HL GREENPOWER INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR102259416B | KR20210155901 |