EP4391514 - CAMERA MOUNTING ASSEMBLY AND CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Hikvision Digital Technology Co., Ltd. No. 555 Qianmo Road, Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Shuaishuai Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 02 /
XIANG, Kun Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 03 /
QI, Fuqiang Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | 04 /
TIAN, Wei Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22899806.8 | 18.05.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022CN93477 | Priority number, date | CN202111447144 | 30.11.2021 Original published format: CN202111447144 | [2024/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023097986 | Date: | 08.06.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4391514 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N/ | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H04N23/50 (EP,CN);
F16M11/041 (EP,CN);
F16M11/16 (EP);
F16M11/22 (EP);
F16M13/02 (EP);
F16M13/025 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERAMONTAGEANORDNUNG UND KAMERA | [2024/26] | English: | CAMERA MOUNTING ASSEMBLY AND CAMERA | [2024/26] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MONTAGE DE CAMÉRA ET CAMÉRA | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2024 | Translation filed | 21.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US8379089 (LEE YOUNG-SOO [KR]); | [A]WO2015118600 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]); | [X]CN209495083U (HANGZHOU HIKVISION DIGITAL TEC); | [A]CN210890788U (IV TECH TIANJIN CO LTD); | [PX]CN114157787 (HANGZHOU HAKANGWEI VISUAL DIGITAL TECH CO LTD) |