EP4376322 - RECEPTION BEAM CONFIGURATION METHOD BY WHICH ELECTRONIC DEVICE RECEIVES SIGNALS TRANSMITTED FROM PLURALITY OF TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION POINTS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Minho Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Taeyoon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Hyoungjoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
HAN, Yonggue Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
LIM, Chaiman Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
JUNG, Euichang Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22904389.8 | 19.08.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022KR12455 | Priority number, date | KR20210174542 | 08.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210174542 | KR20210180403 | 16.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210180403 | [2024/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023106553 | Date: | 15.06.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4376322 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08, H04B7/024, H04B17/318, H04B17/336, H04B17/373, H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04L5/0035 (EP);
H04B7/0888 (US);
H04B17/318 (EP);
H04B17/336 (EP);
H04B17/373 (EP);
H04B7/024 (EP);
H04B7/06952 (EP);
H04B7/08 (EP);
H04B7/0857 (US);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L5/00 (EP);
H04W72/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANGSSTRAHLKONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN VON AUS MEHREREN SENDE- UND EMPFANGSPUNKTEN GESENDETEN SIGNALEN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/22] | English: | RECEPTION BEAM CONFIGURATION METHOD BY WHICH ELECTRONIC DEVICE RECEIVES SIGNALS TRANSMITTED FROM PLURALITY OF TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION POINTS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE FAISCEAU DE RÉCEPTION PAR LEQUEL UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE REÇOIT DES SIGNAUX ÉMIS PAR UNE PLURALITÉ DE POINTS D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2024 | Translation filed | 21.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2020014454 (GUO LI [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0219]-[0233]; and figures 17A-17B. *; | [A]US2020367230 (RAGHAVAN VASANTHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0085]-[0099]; and figure 7. *; | [Y]US2021112561 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al) [Y] 8-10,14-15 * See paragraphs [0099]-[0101]. *; | [Y]US2021167821 (CHEN WEI [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0123], [0132], [0134] and [0139]; and figures 8 and 13A-14B. *; | [Y] - ZTE, "Enhancements on beam management for multi-TRP", 3GPP Draft; R1-2104587, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210512), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210510 - 20210527, XP052010881 [Y] 1-15 * See section 4.2; and figures 4-5. * |