EP4368893 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COOKING AT CONSTANT TEMPERATURE IN OVEN BY USING CONVECTION HEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Shinkyum Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
SON, Changhyun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyunjeong Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jeonghyun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
BAE, Minkyung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
OH, Sungmin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22907655.9 | 15.10.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022KR15669 | Priority number, date | KR20210180376 | 16.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210180376 | [2024/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023113184 | Date: | 22.06.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4368893 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, F24C15/32 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
F24C15/322 (EP);
F24C7/085 (KR,US);
F24C7/087 (EP,US);
F24C15/32 (EP);
F24C15/325 (EP,KR);
F24C3/128 (US);
F24C7/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KOCHEN BEI KONSTANTER TEMPERATUR IN EINEM OFEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KONVEKTIONSWÄRME | [2024/20] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COOKING AT CONSTANT TEMPERATURE IN OVEN BY USING CONVECTION HEAT | [2024/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CUISSON À TEMPÉRATURE CONSTANTE DANS UN FOUR À L'AIDE DE CHALEUR PAR CONVECTION | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2024 | Translation filed | 06.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015354827 (FARALDI PAOLO [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0060]-[0085]; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]EP3165135 (SOUTH BANK UNIV ENTPR LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-18; and figures 1-5. *; | [XA]WO2018148363 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD INC [US]) [X] 1,9,15 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0013] and [0033]; claim 1; and figure 1. * [A] 2-8,10-14; | [A]US2019110630 (KITABAYASHI JOEY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 9-20; and figures 2-3. *; | [A]EP3686495 (VESTEL BEYAZ ESYA SANAYI VE TICARET AS [TR]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-3; and figure 2. * |