EP4317167 - METHOD FOR PREPARING LIQUID MALTITOL AND LIQUID POLYOL BY USING MALTITOL CHROMATOGRAPHIC RAFFINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Huakang Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 18 Huagong Road, Huabu Town, Kaihua Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Yanhui Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Xinfeng Kaihua Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 03 /
WAN, Fuan Kaihua Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 04 /
YUE, Hang Kaihua Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 05 /
SHEN, Weixin Kaihua Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 06 /
DAI, Haojun Kaihua Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 07 /
YANG, Mingqian Kaihua Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 08 /
LI, Mian Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22909617.7 | 21.11.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022CN133110 | Priority number, date | CN202111588188 | 23.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111588188 | [2024/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023116301 | Date: | 29.06.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317167 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04, C07H1/06 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07C29/74 (EP,CN);
C07C29/76 (EP,CN);
C07C29/90 (EP,CN);
C07H1/06 (CN);
Y02P20/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/74, C07C31/26 (CN,EP);
C07C29/76, C07C31/26 (CN,EP);
C07C29/90, C07C31/26 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEM MALTITOL UND FLÜSSIGEM POLYOL UNTER VERWENDUNG VON CHROMATOGRAFISCHEM RAFFINAT AUS MALTITOL | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING LIQUID MALTITOL AND LIQUID POLYOL BY USING MALTITOL CHROMATOGRAPHIC RAFFINATE | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MALTITOL LIQUIDE ET DE POLYOL LIQUIDE À L'AIDE D'UN RAFFINAT CHROMATOGRAPHIQUE DE MALTITOL | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2023 | Translation filed | 26.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |